MO HB1633 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to criminal offenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to criminal offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - House: HB 1633 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: HB 1633 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: HB 1633 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 42 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: HB 1633 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseSenate Message (S)
2018-05-17HouseSenate Requests Further Conference (S)
2018-05-17HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-17HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2018-05-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-16HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-16HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2018-05-16HouseSenate Message (S)
2018-05-16HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS DIXON, EMERY, KOENIG, SIFTON, HOLSMAN
2018-05-16HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-15HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES CORLEW, AUSTIN, ENGLER, FRANKS JR., WASHINGTON
2018-05-15HouseSenate Message (S)
2018-05-15HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2018-05-15HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-15HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
2018-05-15HouseSEE COMMENTS - Motion to adopt SS as amended withrawn
2018-05-15HouseTaken Up
2018-05-14HouseLaid Over (H)
2018-05-14HouseSEE COMMENTS - Motion to send SS SCS HB 1633 as amended to Conference defeated AYES: 42 NOES: 104 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-14HouseTaken Up
2018-05-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-11HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-11SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2018-05-11SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 adopted AYES: 30 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-11SenateSS Adopted (S)
2018-05-11SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-05-11SenateTaken Up
2018-05-11SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-09SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 11, 2018, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2018-05-09SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-05-07SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-30SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-04-23SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-19SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Mondsy, April 23, 2018, 2:30pm, Senate Lounge
2018-04-12SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2018-04-05HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-04-05HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-05HouseTaken Up
2018-03-28HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-03-28HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-28HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-26HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-31HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-01-31HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-30HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-11HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-14HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1633&year=2018&code=R
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5357H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5357H.01P.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5357S.03C.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5357S.04F.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5357H.05S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/050.002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/Journals/RDay6905111845-1894.pdf#1888
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/073.003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/076.019.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/076.018.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback