MO HB163 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding unemployment compensation and makes Missouri eligible to receive extended federal unemployment benefit funds
Title
Changes the laws regarding unemployment compensation and makes Missouri eligible to receive extended federal unemployment benefit funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-04-13 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-04-13 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-04-13 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-04-12 | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill | |
2011-04-12 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-04-12 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-04-11 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2011-04-07 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-16 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-02 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-03-01 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-02-24 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-02-23 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-02-23 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-02-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-02-21 | Second Read and Referred: Small Business, Insurance, and Industry (S) | |
2011-02-01 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-02-01 | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) | |
2011-02-01 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-01-31 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-01-31 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-01-26 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-01-26 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-01-26 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-24 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-01-24 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-01-24 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-01-24 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-24 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety (H) | |
2011-01-12 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |