MO HB1622 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Workforce Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Workforce Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that a state employee who works 10 hour days and 40 hours per week cannot be required to take two hours of vacation leave for paid holidays.
Title
Specifies that a state employee who works 10 hour days and 40 hours per week cannot be required to take two hours of vacation leave for paid holidays.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1622&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3820H.01I.pdf |