MO HB1619 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the aggregate amount of tuition charged by a receiving school district during a school year must not exceed $10,000 per pupil when a student transfers from an unaccredited district
Title
Specifies that the aggregate amount of tuition charged by a receiving school district during a school year must not exceed $10,000 per pupil when a student transfers from an unaccredited district
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-04-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1619&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1619I.htm |