MO HB1611 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Utilities(H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Utilities(H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows customers of utilities to opt out of installation of certain types of meters.
Title
Allows customers of utilities to opt out of installation of certain types of meters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1611&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3451H.01I.pdf |