MO HB1610 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-26 - Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-26 - Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding rates charged by natural gas corporations and assistance for eligible households through the Utilicare Program
Title
Changes the laws regarding rates charged by natural gas corporations and assistance for eligible households through the Utilicare Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-04-26 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-23 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-23 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred: Utilities (H) | |
2010-01-14 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1610&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1610I.htm |