MO HB16 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
[TITLE UNAVAILABLE]
Title
[TITLE UNAVAILABLE]
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: HB 16 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: HB 16 HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: HB 16 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: HB 16 HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, February 8, 2021, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, February 4, 2021, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - February 3, 2021, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-01-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted AYES: 149 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-01-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 28 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-01-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-25 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2021-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |