MO HB16 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the offense of unlawful transfer of weapons to include a class E felony for transferring a firearm to a minor for the purpose of avoiding, interfering with, or preventing an arrest, detention, or investigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the offense of unlawful transfer of weapons to include a class E felony for transferring a firearm to a minor for the purpose of avoiding, interfering with, or preventing an arrest, detention, or investigation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 16 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 96 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 16 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 16 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 16 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 92 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 16 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 41 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 16 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 88 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 16 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 37 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-09-16HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-09-16HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-09-09HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-09-09SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended
2020-09-02SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 3, SA 5, SA 6 adopted AYES: 25 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-09-02SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2020-09-02SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2020-09-02SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-09-02SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2020-09-02SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-09-01SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, September 2, 2020, Senate Chamber, 9:30a.m.
2020-09-01SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-09-01SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2020-09-01SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2020-09-01SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-09-01SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-08-31SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 2:00 p.m., Tuesday, September 1, 2020, Senate Chamber
2020-08-31SenateSecond read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2020-08-28HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-08-25HouseEmergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 99 NOES: 49 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-25HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 45 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-25HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-08-25HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2020-08-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-08-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-08-24HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-08-24HousePerfected (H)
2020-08-24HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2020-08-24HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-08-24HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-08-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-08-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-08-17HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-08-17HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-17HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-08-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-08-17HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-08-12HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2020-08-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-07-27HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB16&year=2020&code=S1
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/hlrbillspdf/5806H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/hlrbillspdf/5806H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/hlrbillspdf/5806H.02P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/hlrbillspdf/5806S.05C.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/rollcalls/008.017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/rollcalls/008.016.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/rollcalls/008.015.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/rollcalls/008.014.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/rollcalls/009.012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/rollcalls/009.013.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/rollcalls/009.011.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/T1Day11090248-75.pdf#70

Bill Comments

feedback