MO HB1598 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to preneed contracts
Title
Modifies provisions relating to preneed contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House: HB 1598 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 12, 2018, 2:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Professional Registration(S) |
2018-02-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-13 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-13 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |