MO HB1590 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding state contracts, taxation, and the Department of Economic Development
Title
Changes the laws regarding state contracts, taxation, and the Department of Economic Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House: HB 1590 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 115 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 9, 2022, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 22, 2022, 10:30 a.m. or upon morning recess, Senate Lounge |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Economic Development(S) |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-02-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HSA 1 for HA 1, adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-02-08 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-01-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-01-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-01-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-01-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |