MO HB159 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes provisions governing the suspension of students from public schools
Title
Changes provisions governing the suspension of students from public schools
Sponsors
Rep. Ian Mackey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-05-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |