MO HB1589 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds that a person who has been found guilty of possession of child pornography shall not be within 500 feet of certain locations
Title
Adds that a person who has been found guilty of possession of child pornography shall not be within 500 feet of certain locations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: HB 1589 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 19, 2022, 1:30 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2022-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 140 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2 |
2022-03-09 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2022-03-03 | House | Perfected (H) |
2022-03-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-03-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-01-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-01-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-01-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |