MO HB1575 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires natural immunity to be considered equivalent to vaccine-induced immunity for viral infections
Title
Requires natural immunity to be considered equivalent to vaccine-induced immunity for viral infections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |