MO HB1574 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a person to apply for a veteran designation on his or her driver's license or identification card upon providing specified proof of service
Title
Allows a person to apply for a veteran designation on his or her driver's license or identification card upon providing specified proof of service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs (S) | |
2012-04-23 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-19 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 1 | |
2012-04-18 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-04-18 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-28 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Veterans (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |