MO HB1572 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the month of September as "Deaf Awareness Month" and the last week of September as "Deaf Awareness Week."
Title
Designates the month of September as "Deaf Awareness Month" and the last week of September as "Deaf Awareness Week."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1572&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4064H.01I.pdf |