MO HB1568 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the City of Sugar Creek to impose, upon voter approval, a transient guest tax for the promotion of tourism
Title
Authorizes the City of Sugar Creek to impose, upon voter approval, a transient guest tax for the promotion of tourism
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Salva [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2010-01-12 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1568&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1568I.htm |