MO HB1565 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions governing school district course materials or instruction on human sexuality or sexually transmitted diseases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions governing school district course materials or instruction on human sexuality or sexually transmitted diseases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseAction Postponed (H)
2020-03-10HouseExecutive Session Continued
2020-02-25HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-02-06HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-03HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback