MO HB156 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the Uniform Arbitration Act regarding agreements between employers and at-will employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the Uniform Arbitration Act regarding agreements between employers and at-will employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-29HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-03-07HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-03-07HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-06HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-31HouseReferred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-06HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback