MO HB1559 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: Small Business and Industry(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts certain schools from the state minimum wage law requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts certain schools from the state minimum wage law requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House: HB 1559 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateSecond read and referred: Small Business and Industry(S)
2020-02-27HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-02-27HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 53 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-27HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-02-25HousePerfected (H)
2020-02-25HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-02-24HouseHolds Place on the Calendar (H)
2020-02-24HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-02-24HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-01-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-22HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-01-22HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-22HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-22HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-14HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-03HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback