MO HB1558 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the offense of nonconsensual dissemination of private sexual images
Title
Creates the offense of nonconsensual dissemination of private sexual images
Sponsors
Rep. James Neely [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: HB 1558 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: HB 1558 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: HB 1558 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: HB 1558 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: HB 1558 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: HB 1558 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: HB 1558 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-01 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-11 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-05-10 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 138 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 131 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Taken Up |
2018-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-05-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-03 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 18, 2018, 1:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2018-02-26 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-20 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-20 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |