MO HB1553 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Failed to Pass over Veto (H) - AYES: 95 NOES: 65 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding political subdivisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding political subdivisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-10HouseFailed to Pass over Veto (H) - AYES: 95 NOES: 65 PRESENT: 1
2014-09-10HouseTaken Up
2014-07-07HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-07-07HouseVetoed by Governor (G)
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-05-16HouseSenate Message (S)
2014-05-16HouseSenate Message (S)
2014-05-16HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29 NOES: 1
2014-05-16HouseSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 29 NOES: 1
2014-05-16HouseSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2014-05-16HouseTaken Up
2014-05-16HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-16HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 84 NOES: 58
2014-05-16HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 88 NOES: 55
2014-05-16HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-05-15HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2014-05-15HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-15HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES DOHRMAN, ALLEN, COLONA
2014-05-15HouseSenate Message (S)
2014-05-15HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS PEARCE, DIXON, SCHAEFER, KEAVENY, NASHEED
2014-05-15HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2014-05-14HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-14HouseHouse Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
2014-05-14HouseTaken Up
2014-05-13SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED
2014-05-13SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 ADOPTED AYES: 26 NOES: 3
2014-05-13SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2014-05-13SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-05-08SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2014-05-07SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
2014-04-16SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2014-04-14SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, Noon or upon noon adjournment, Senate Lounge
2014-04-03SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S)
2014-04-01HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-31HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 129 NOES: 21
2014-03-31HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-03-27HousePerfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-20HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-02-20HouseReported Do Pass by Consent (H)
2014-02-20HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2014-02-20HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-02-13HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-01-29HouseReferred: Local Government(H)
2014-01-23HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-01-22HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback