MO HB1552 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Changes provisions related to funding for charter schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes provisions related to funding for charter schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-12 - House - House: HB 1552 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: HB 1552 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 116 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: HB 1552 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 109 N: 28 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: HB 1552 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: HB 1552 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 85 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: HB 1552 (*HSA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 63 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - House - House: HB 1552 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: HB 1552 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 82 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-18SenateDelivered to Governor
2022-05-18SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2022-05-18SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2022-05-11SenateHouse Message (H)
2022-05-12SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 116 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 4
2022-05-12SenateHouse Adopts (H) - SS SCS AYES: 109 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 11
2022-05-12SenateTaken Up
2022-04-21SenateReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2022-04-21SenateVoted Do Pass (H)
2022-04-21SenateExecutive Session Completed (H)
2022-04-20SenateReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2022-04-20SenateSenate Message (S)
2022-04-20SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 29 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2022-04-20SenateTaken Up
2022-04-19SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2022-04-19SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2022-04-14SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 19, 2022, 3:30 p.m, Senate Lounge.
2022-04-08SenateHearing Cancelled (S)
2022-04-07SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 11, 2022, 3:30 p.m., Senate Lounge.
2022-04-06SenateReferred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
2022-04-06SenateSS Adopted (S)
2022-04-06SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2022-04-06SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2022-03-29SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2022-03-28SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2022-03-28SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2022-03-28SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2022-03-16SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 12:00 p.m. or upon conclusion of Economic Development (whichever is later), Senate Lounge, Tuesday, March 22, 2022
2022-03-10SenateSecond read and referred: Education(S)
2022-03-09HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2022-03-09HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 85 NOES: 67 PRESENT: 0
2022-03-09HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2022-03-09HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2022-03-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2022-03-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2022-03-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2022-03-08HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2022-03-07HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 5, HA 7, adopted. AYES: 82 NOES: 64 PRESENT: 1
2022-03-07HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2022-03-07HouseMotion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - HA 4 AYES: 101 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 7
2022-03-07HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2022-03-07HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2022-02-23HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2022-02-14HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2022-01-26HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2022-01-20HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2022-01-20HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2022-01-20HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2022-01-14HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2022-01-14HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0
2022-01-13HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2022-01-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2022-01-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2022-01-06HouseReferred: Budget(H)
2022-01-06HouseRead Second Time (H)
2022-01-05HouseRead First Time (H)
2021-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1552&year=2022&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/hlrbillspdf/3565H.02I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/hlrbillspdf/3565H.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/hlrbillspdf/3565H.03P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/hlrbillspdf/3565S.06C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/hlrbillspdf/3565S.11F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/hlrbillspdf/3565S.11T.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H02.10H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.08H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.01H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.04H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.05H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.14H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.13H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.15H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.16H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.18H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.19H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.21H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.22H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.23H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.26H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.27H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.28H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/amendpdf/3565H03.29H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/sumpdf/HB1552I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/fiscal/fispdf/3565H.02I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/sumpdf/HB1552C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/fiscal/fispdf/3565H.03C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/fiscal/fispdf/3565H.03P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/sumpdf/HB1552P.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/fiscal/fispdf/3565S.06C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/fiscal/fispdf/3565S.11F.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/sumpdf/HB1552T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/rollcalls/033.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/rollcalls/033.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/rollcalls/033.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/rollcalls/035.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/rollcalls/035.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/22info/Journals/RDay5104201732-1752.pdf#1734
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/rollcalls/070.012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/rollcalls/070.013.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/rollcalls/070.011.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback