MO HB1551 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a court to order each party to a child custody order to provide the court with an annual report specifying whether the party is in compliance with the order and an accounting of child support payments
Title
Allows a court to order each party to a child custody order to provide the court with an annual report specifying whether the party is in compliance with the order and an accounting of child support payments
Sponsors
Rep. James Neely [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1551&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1551I.PDF |