MO HB1551 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Community Protection Act which regulates sexually oriented businesses
Title
Establishes the Community Protection Act which regulates sexually oriented businesses
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred: Crime Prevention (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1551&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1551I.htm |