MO HB1546 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides immunity from civil liability for disclosures by a charity, nonprofit organization, religious organization, or church of allegations of sexual misconduct
Title
Provides immunity from civil liability for disclosures by a charity, nonprofit organization, religious organization, or church of allegations of sexual misconduct
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Richey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-04-19 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |