MO HB1540 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires judicial procedures for an infraction to be the same as for a misdemeanor and requires motorists to obey reasonable signals and directions given by law enforcement in the enforcement of infractions
Title
Requires judicial procedures for an infraction to be the same as for a misdemeanor and requires motorists to obey reasonable signals and directions given by law enforcement in the enforcement of infractions
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Lipke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-02-25 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-02-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-02-25 | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-02-25 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Recedes from Position (S) | |
2010-02-25 | House Requests Senate to Recede (H) - TAKE UP AND PASS HCS HB 1540 | |
2010-02-25 | House Refuses to Concur (H) - TO ADOPT SA 1 AYES: 75 NOES: 79 | |
2010-02-24 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SA 1 | |
2010-02-23 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-02-23 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-02-23 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 PENDING | |
2010-02-23 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-02-15 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-02-15 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-02-15 | Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S) | |
2010-02-11 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-02-11 | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-02-11 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-02-10 | Perfected (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-02-10 | HCS Adopted (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-02-08 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-08 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-08 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-03 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-01-27 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-01-20 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-14 | Referred: Crime Prevention (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |