MO HB1539 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Referred: Insurance Policy(H)
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Referred: Insurance Policy(H)
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all motor vehicle insurers to notify the Department of Revenue of lapsed policies in order to allow the owner to provide proof of insurance or surrender the license plates if no proof is provided.
Title
Requires all motor vehicle insurers to notify the Department of Revenue of lapsed policies in order to allow the owner to provide proof of insurance or surrender the license plates if no proof is provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Morris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1539&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4984H.01I.pdf |