MO HB1537 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the definition of special victim to include staff members of the division of youth services
Title
Expands the definition of special victim to include staff members of the division of youth services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |