MO HB1535 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a coroner to notify the appropriate prosecuting attorney instead of an associate circuit judge when he or she completes an inquisition regarding a death by a felonious act
Title
Requires a coroner to notify the appropriate prosecuting attorney instead of an associate circuit judge when he or she completes an inquisition regarding a death by a felonious act
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Black [R] | Rep. Linda Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-18 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-17 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred: Judiciary (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1535&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1535I.htm |