MO HB1531 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to civil proceedings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to civil proceedings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1531 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1531 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 110 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: HB 1531 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: HB 1531 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-01HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-03-28HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-03-28HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 110 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-28HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS asamended AYES: 112 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-28HouseTaken Up
2018-03-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-15HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-03-15SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2018-03-14SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 adopted AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-14SenateSS Adopted (S)
2018-03-14SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-03-14SenateTaken Up
2018-03-08SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-02-21SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-02-21SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-02-20SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, February 21, 2018, 8:00am, SCR 1
2018-02-19SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Government Reform(S)
2018-01-29HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-01-25HouseThird Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HPA 1 adopted AYES: 99 NOES: 45 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-25HouseTaken Up
2018-01-23HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HSA 1 for HA 1 adopted
2018-01-23HouseTaken Up
2018-01-23HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-01-22HouseLaid Over (H)
2018-01-22HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-01-22HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-01-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-16HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-01-16HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-16HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-16HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-09HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-07HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1531&year=2018&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4988H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4988H.01P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4988H.01D.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4988S.05F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4988S.05T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/Journals/RDay400314639-702.pdf#698
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/013.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/013.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/045.017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/045.016.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback