MO HB153 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of revenue to establish a system in which persons who own multiple farm vehicles can elect to have the vehicles placed on the same registration renewal schedule
Title
Requires the department of revenue to establish a system in which persons who own multiple farm vehicles can elect to have the vehicles placed on the same registration renewal schedule
Sponsors
Rep. Don Rone [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House: HB 153 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 153 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-02-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |