MO HB153 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H)
Pending: House Corrections and Public Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Corrections to perform specified actions to improve the ability of working inmates to obtain employment upon release from incarceration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Department of Corrections to perform specified actions to improve the ability of working inmates to obtain employment upon release from incarceration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseReferred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-03HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback