MO HB152 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows school districts to authorize and commission school officers to enforce laws relating to crimes committed on school grounds, at school activities, and on school buses
Title
Allows school districts to authorize and commission school officers to enforce laws relating to crimes committed on school grounds, at school activities, and on school buses
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Solon [R] | Rep. T.J. Berry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-11 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 124 NOES: 22 |
2013-05-17 | House | House Concurs (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 126 NOES: 19 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 8. 2013, 12:3PM, SCR 1 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 24, 2013, 1:30pm, SENATE LOUNGE |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-03 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 129 NOES: 20 |
2013-04-03 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-02 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED |
2013-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2013-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |