MO HB1517 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the attorney general and the commissioner of administration to submit to the general assembly a monthly report of all settlements and judgments paid from the state legal expense fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the attorney general and the commissioner of administration to submit to the general assembly a monthly report of all settlements and judgments paid from the state legal expense fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: HB 1517 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-25SenateApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-17SenateSenate Message (S)
2018-05-16SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-16SenateTaken Up
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-15SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-14SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-10SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-05-09SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, May 10, 2018, 9:00am, SCR 1
2018-03-29SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Government Reform(S)
2018-03-13HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-13HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-13HouseTaken Up
2018-03-07HousePerfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2018-02-27HouseReported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-27HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2018-02-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-20HouseReferred: Consent and House Procedure(H)
2018-02-20HouseReported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 28 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-14HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-06HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: Budget(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-06HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback