MO HB1503 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a fund for providing state-guaranteed small business loans to veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a fund for providing state-guaranteed small business loans to veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1503 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1503 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: HB 1503 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-01HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-18HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-18HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 130 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 136 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-18HouseTaken Up
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-09HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-09SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS
2018-05-09SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-09SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2018-05-09SenateTaken Up
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-03SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-03SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-02SenateExecutive Session Scheduled
2018-05-01SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-04-30SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-26SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-04-19SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-17SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 19, 2018, 8:00am, SCR 1
2018-04-11SenateHearing Cancelled (S)
2018-04-09SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 12, 2018, 8:00am, SCR 1
2018-03-29SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Veterans’ and Military Affairs(S)
2018-03-21HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-15HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 136 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
2018-03-15HouseTaken Up
2018-03-13HousePerfected (H)
2018-03-13HouseHCS#2 Adopted (H)
2018-03-13HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-13HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-21HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-21HouseHCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-20HouseHCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-20HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-15HouseReturned to Committee of Origin (H) - Veterans AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-14HouseVoted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H)
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-31HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-01-31HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-30HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-11HouseReferred: Veterans(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-05HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1503&year=2018&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4511H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4511H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4511H.04C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4511H.04P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4511S.07C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4511S.07T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/041.017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/Journals/RDay6705091746-1788.pdf#1753
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/077.041.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/077.040.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback