MO HB1501 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits law enforcement agencies from transferring seized property to a federal agency in forfeiture litigation except if the seized property is $100,000 or more in currency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits law enforcement agencies from transferring seized property to a federal agency in forfeiture litigation except if the seized property is $100,000 or more in currency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-02-06HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-01-30HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-05HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback