MO HB1501 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 6 OFFERED
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 6 OFFERED
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Distressed Area Land Assemblage Tax Credit Act
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Distressed Area Land Assemblage Tax Credit Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Zerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 6 OFFERED |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - sa 3, sa 4 adopted/SS as amended pending |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted Do Pass |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Senate Lounge upon noon recess. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2014-03-10 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 96 NOES: 54 |
2014-03-06 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-03-05 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2014-03-05 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-05 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |