MO HB1491 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the termination of parental rights
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the termination of parental rights
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-05-02 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed Back on Perfection Calendar |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-20 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |