MO HB1490 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding academic performance and learning standards in elementary and secondary education
Title
Changes the laws regarding academic performance and learning standards in elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Bahr [R] | Rep. Bryan Spencer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-14 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-14 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-15 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 23 NOES: 6 |
2014-05-15 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 22 NOES: 7 |
2014-05-15 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2014-05-15 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-15 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-15 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 94 NOES: 51 |
2014-05-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 10 |
2014-05-15 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 12 |
2014-05-15 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-05-14 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2014-05-14 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-14 | House | Conferees Re-appointed (S) - SENATORS: EMERY, PEARCE, LAMPING, CHAPPELLE-NADAL, KEAVENY |
2014-05-14 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-14 | House | Conferees Re-appointed (H) - Representatives: BAHR, DIEHL, MONTECILLO |
2014-05-14 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-14 | House | Conferees to Exceed Differences (H) - Section 161.855 |
2014-05-14 | House | House Grants Conference (H) |
2014-05-14 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-14 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-14 | House | Conferees to Exceed Differences (S) - Section 161.855 |
2014-05-14 | House | Senate Requests Further Conference (S) |
2014-05-14 | House | Senate Refuses to Adopt (C) - CCR |
2014-05-13 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-13 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 70 NOES: 72 |
2014-05-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 1 |
2014-05-13 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 9 |
2014-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-12 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2014-05-07 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-07 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES BAHR, DIEHL, MONTECILLO |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - EMERY, PEARCE, LAMPING, CHAPPELLE-NADAL, KEAVENY |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2014-05-06 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-06 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2014-05-06 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS AS AMENDED |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 24 NOES: 8 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, SA 10, SA 1 TO SA 11, SA 11 AS AMENDED, SA 12, SA 14, SA 15 ADOPTED AYES: 23 NOES: 9 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 17/SS AS AMENDED PENDING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) - SA 14, SA 15, ADOPTED |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, SA 10, SA 1 TO SA 11, SA 11 AS AMENDED, SA 12 ADOPTED/SA 13/SS AS AMENDED PENDING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) - SA 1, SA 4,SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, SA 10, SA 1 TO HA 11, HA 11 AS AMENDED, HA 12 ADOPTED |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 4, ADOPTED/SA 5, SS AS AMENDED PENDING |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday. April 23, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 132 NOES: 19 |
2014-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-08 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - ha 2 to ha 1, ha 3 to ha 1, ha 1 as amended, ha 2 to ha 2, ha 2 as amended, ha 3 adopted |
2014-04-08 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |