MO HB1486 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts health care entities registered with the Department of Health and Senior Services that distribute hypodermic needles or syringes from the crime of unlawful delivery of drug paraphernalia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts health care entities registered with the Department of Health and Senior Services that distribute hypodermic needles or syringes from the crime of unlawful delivery of drug paraphernalia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: HB 1486 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateSecond read and referred: General Laws(S)
2020-02-24HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-02-24HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 22 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-24HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-02-18HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1
2020-02-18HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-02-18HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-02-18HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2020-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-03HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-02-03HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-16HouseReferred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-02HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback