MO HB1478 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the bonding requirement for the treasurer of a seven-director school district
Title
Modifies the bonding requirement for the treasurer of a seven-director school district
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - House - House: HB 1478 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 156 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-28 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 4, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 156 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-02 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2016-02-02 | House | Taken Up |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred: Banking(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |