MO HB1474 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes requirements for public schools regarding parents and curricula
Title
Establishes requirements for public schools regarding parents and curricula
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-01-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |