MO HB1472 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the designation of controlled substances
Title
Changes the laws regarding the designation of controlled substances
Sponsors
Rep. Ward Franz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-06 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-13 | Emergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 101 NOES: 49 | |
2010-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 140 NOES: 7 | |
2010-05-13 | House Concurs (H) - SA 1 ADPOPTED AYES: 138 NOES: 8 | |
2010-05-05 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SA 1 | |
2010-05-05 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-05 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-05 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-01 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2010-03-25 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, MARCH 29, 2010, UPON ADJOURNMENT, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2010-03-18 | Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S) | |
2010-03-17 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-17 | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-17 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-15 | Perfected (H) | |
2010-03-15 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-03-15 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Laid Over (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2010-03-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-24 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-24 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-16 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-16 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-16 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred: Public Safety (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-29 | Prefiled (H) |