MO HB1464 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts motorcyclists 21 years of age or older from wearing a helmet when operating a motorcycle or motortricycle if they have the appropriate health insurance coverage
Title
Exempts motorcyclists 21 years of age or older from wearing a helmet when operating a motorcycle or motortricycle if they have the appropriate health insurance coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - House: HB 1464 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-02 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 27, 2016, 8:15am, SCR 1 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-07 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-05 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 2 adopted |
2016-04-05 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |