MO HB1457 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Referred: General Laws(H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows persons who can lawfully carry firearms to sue for certain injuries sustained on the property of businesses that voluntarily prohibit firearms.
Title
Allows persons who can lawfully carry firearms to sue for certain injuries sustained on the property of businesses that voluntarily prohibit firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1457&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3722H.02I.pdf |