MO HB1457 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions related to computer science
Title
Creates new provisions related to computer science
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-05-02 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed Back on Perfection Calendar |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-15 | House | Placed Back on Perfection Calendar |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-12 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-12 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |