MO HB1456 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates "Old Drum" as the state historical dog and "Jim the Wonder Dog" as Missouri's Wonder Dog
Title
Designates "Old Drum" as the state historical dog and "Jim the Wonder Dog" as Missouri's Wonder Dog
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 29, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 8 |
2014-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources(H) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |