MO HB1456 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding 911 emergency communication services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding 911 emergency communication services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-04-09SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 11, 2018, 1:00pm, Senate Lounge
2018-03-28SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-27SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 28, 2018, 1:00pm, Senate Lounge
2018-03-15SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment(S)
2018-03-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-07HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 111 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-07HouseTaken Up
2018-03-05HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-01HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-02-28HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-02-28HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-02-28HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-02-28HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-31HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-30HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-01-30HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-30HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-17HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-04HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback