MO HB1451 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to charter schools
Title
Modifies provisions relating to charter schools
Sponsors
Rep. David Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - House - House: HB 1451 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House: HB 1451 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: HB 1451 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 104 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: HB 1451 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 43 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-03-14 - House - House: HB 1451 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: HB 1451 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 104 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: HB 1451 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 43 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 10, 2016, 2:15pm, SCR 2 |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 4, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 27, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2016-03-14 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-14 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 53 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-14 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 118 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |