MO HB1444 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the requirement that all motor vehicles must obtain an inspection before the vehicle may be licensed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals the requirement that all motor vehicles must obtain an inspection before the vehicle may be licensed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseDropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2018-05-02HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-04-10HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-28HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-03-28HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-14HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-28HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-17HousePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Transportation(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-04HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback